This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 13:32:28 (UTC).

JAY BARBER ET AL VS RAMIREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/09/2016 JAY BARBER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Holladay, Brandon. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6149

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAY BARBER, THOMAS

PAUL STARK, JAMES

WILLIAM FORTHMAN, RONNIE

Defendants

ENTERPRISE FM TRUST

INTERACTIVE MARKETING SERVICES, INC.

BROADBAND INTERACTIVE

RAMIREZ, CARLOS

INTERACTIVE MARKETING SERVICES, INC. DBA BROARDBAND INTERACTIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZAVIDOW, ROBERT M

BISH, MINDY S

Defendant Attorney

O'CONNOR, EDWARD R

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: crc 3.1385

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference 08/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: O'CONNOR, EDWARD R; Defendant; Attorney: O'CONNOR, EDWARD R; Defendant; Attorney: O'CONNOR, EDWARD R; Defendant; Attorney: O'CONNOR, EDWARD R; Defendant; Attorney: O'CONNOR, EDWARD R

Ruling

Ruling 06/28/2017: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Motion for Order - Needs to be Renotice - Calendar is Full

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Motion to Compel - Needs to be Renoticed - Calendar is Full

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: O'CONNOR, EDWARD R; Defendant; Attorney: O'CONNOR, EDWARD R; Defendant; Attorney: O'CONNOR, EDWARD R; Defendant; Attorney: O'CONNOR, EDWARD R; Defendant; Attorney: O'CONNOR, EDWARD R

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: ROBERT M. ZAVIDOW RE: CMC STATEMENT REASON: CASE NUMBER IS INCORRECT.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/23/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: pursuant to crc rule 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: crc 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional - Comment: Notice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to ENTERPRISE FM TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Enterrise FM Trust. Certified Mail.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Broadband Interactive. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Interactive Marketing Services, Inc. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY EDWARD R. O'CONNOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to CARLOS RAMIREZ personally served on 1/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/16/2017; Served: 01/17/2017; Served: 01/30/2017; Served: 01/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/23/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.