This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 02:22:16 (UTC).

JAXON ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA DEER CREEK ASPHALT VS DMP2 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2016 JAXON ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA DEER CREEK ASPHALT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DMP2 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R., Etienne, Linda S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1358

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Etienne, Linda S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAXON ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA DEER CREEK ASPHALT

Defendants

SHAMROCK GROUP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS SHAMROCK PAVING, INC.

DMP2 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SHAMROCK GROUP, INC., DBA SHAMROCK PAVING, INC.

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas corporation

DMP2

Cross Plaintiffs

DMP 2 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP0

SHAMROCK GROUP, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS SHAMROCK PAVING, INC.

Cross Defendants

PATTERSON, DRU

PATTERSON BUILDERS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PATTERSON BUILDERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PATTERSON BUILDERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BANDELL, LEONARD

QUALL, MATTHEW W

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

MADONI, STEPHEN ANGELO

TKACH, JOHN A

Cross Defendant Attorney

CARLTON, ANDREW C

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 8-9-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 12:00 PM; Result: Department Transfer

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 03/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Cont'd from 12/13/16); Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Leonard Bandell Document: Stipulation and Order to File Second Amended Complaint Document is incomplete. Exhibit "A" is not attached to the stipulation. A stand alone proposed Second Amneded Complaint must be filed as a separate lead document. A $20 fee is also required for the processing of the stipulation.

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition)

2/27/17 MO: Motion to Amend Complaint: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/2/17 Plaintiff Motion to Amend Complaint ResID: 23902 ************************************************* TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AND FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. *****************************************************

Demurrer

Demurrer: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/12/16 Cross-Defendants, DRU R PATTERSON and PATTERSON BUILDERS Demurrer to Cross-Complainant Shamrock Group, Inc.'s First Amended Cross-Complaint ResID: 23517 ************************************************** TENTATIVE: OVERRULE DEMURRER. ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT TO BE SERVED AND FILE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS. *****************************************************

Case Management Conference

12/13/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Jury Trial 01/29/18; T/E 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS (D-4) FCMC 1/19/18 TD 1/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: ordering presiding judge of L.A. to assign a trial judge.(Reviewed 10/16/17 by Judge Sidney P Chapin - No Action Taken)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order Dated 8-9-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: of order re coordination proocedings. Matter is stayed pending assignment of coordination trial judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 4/21/17 Plaintiff, JAXON ENTERPRISES Motion for Summary Judgment [CCP 437c] against Suretec Insurance Company [Third Cause of Action] for recovery on bond to release mechanic's lien, or in the alternative, Motion to enforce liability on the bond ResID: 24556 TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR HEARING ONLY. DEPARTMENT 4 IS DARK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: Leonard Bandell Date of Letter: 6/26/2017 Re: Request to drop Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 7/12/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 12:00 PM; Result: Department Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketSummons on Cross-Complaint Issued - Comment: DMP2 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP Summons on Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketCross Complaint - Comment: DMP2 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: DMP2 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Shamrock Group, Inc. sub served 6/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to DMP2 Limited Partnership sub served 6/30/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/29/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/30/201610:30 AM; Served: 06/28/20164:25 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less