This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:47:32 (UTC).

JARRED VS WESTCHESTER GARDENS LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 JARRED filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WESTCHESTER GARDENS LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2492

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JARRED, AMELIA

JARRED

Defendants

MISTRY, MANISHA

WESTCHESTER GARDENS LLC DBA WESTCHESTER GARDENS

WESTCHESTER GARDENS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEREHI, KARLA

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: AMKBER THAM RE: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REASON: DEPARTMENT # IS INCORRECT

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/03/17 Hearing Time: 08:00 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 10-31-16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: JURY FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: J/T & FCMC SET 3/26/18 9AM DEPT 11 JURY FOR PLAINTIFF & DEFENDANT T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: M/O dated 8-18-17 as to Louis Pappas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Notice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Westchester Gardens, LLC. dba Westchester Gardens. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Manisha Mistry. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Minute Order Dated 10-31-16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Peremptory Challenge - Comment: As to Judge Sidney P. Chapin, filed by Karla Zerehi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/03/17 Hearing Time: 08:00 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less