Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:03:50 (UTC).

JANICE M WHITE AND EUGENE V WHITE REVOCABLE TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/13/2015 JANICE M WHITE AND EUGENE filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against WHITE REVOCABLE TRUST. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Knight, Alisa R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2214

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Knight, Alisa R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

WHITE, JANICE M

Not Yet Classified

WHITE, EUGENE V

WHITE, JANICE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

SWANSON, TIMOTHY

SWANSON, TIMOTHY D.

 

Court Documents

Petition

MO Petition for Order: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND TRUST ASSETS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SWANSON, TIMOTHY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2016
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: Confirming Successor Trustee and Trust Assets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - MO Petition for Order: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND TRUST ASSETS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SWANSON, TIMOTHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Last Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-16-001025 Will Dated: 6/18/2013; Five (5) Pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Original Will Returned to Timothy Swanson via AMS Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Supplemental Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 4/7/2016 @ 9:00 a.m. in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 4/7/2016 @ 9:00 a.m. in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Petition - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES: 1. Title of pleading is not in compliance w/Rule of Court 7.102. Title of petition does not match prayer. Additionally, petitioner is the Trustee, not successor Trustee. 2. Need proof of service on Primerica & Kern Federal Credit Union per PC 851. 3. Need original Will lodged & endorsed copy filed in within case no. BPB-15-002214.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SWANSON, TIMOTHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 11/19/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Probate Documents - Requested By: WHITE, JANICE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Petition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition for Order confirming Successor Trustee and Trust Assets [Probate code 850(a)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less