This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:34:18 (UTC).

JANETTA C. HERNANDEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JOSHUA TEAGUE, DECEASED ET AL VS PARRELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 JANETTA C HERNANDEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JOSHUA TEAGUE, DECEASED filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PARRELES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2362

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JANETTA C. HERNANDEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JOSHUA TEAGUE, DECEASED

TERRY D. TEAGUE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JOSHUA TEAGUE, DECEASED

Defendants

ZARAGOZA, RAUL I.

PARRELES, RUTH MARTINEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK, MATTHEW C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO RUTH MARTINEZ, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO RAUL ZARAGOZA, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/24/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/18/2017; Served: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: BY SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JOSHUA TEAGUE, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less