This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/06/2021 at 07:07:58 (UTC).

JANE DOE 6 VS KERN HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 JANE DOE 6 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KERN HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1103

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANE DOE 6

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, EDWIN

RIZZO, MELISSA

ANDERSON, APRIL

BALCH, MARK

RODRIGUEZ, JOSIE

KERN HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TRUJILLO, CHANTAL A

RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL

ROJAS-INIGUEZ, DANAY S.

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH, T MARK

ALIMI, NAZLI

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement has been filed and OSC re: Dismissal is scheduled for 12/11/2020

Ruling

Ruling 10/02/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: re: Notice of Settlement

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: T Mark Smith For: Answer to Complaint Reason: Please submit First appearance fees for all answering parties.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/24/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice - as to Entire Action - Each party shall bear their own attorney fees and costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE LAMPE IN DEPT. 11A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: **Granted** Extension to file Request for Dismissal is granted until 1/25/21. Order to Show Cause Hearing is continued to 1/25/21 @ 9:15 am in Dept. 11A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Progress - Comment: requesting extension of time to file Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement has been filed and OSC re: Dismissal is scheduled for 12/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 10/02/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: re: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Kern High School District via Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Mark Balch via Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Melissa RIzzo via Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to April Anderson via Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/23/2020; Served: 06/23/2020; Served: 06/23/2020; Served: 06/23/2020; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/24/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KERN HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRUJILLO, CHANTAL A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROJAS-INIGUEZ, DANAY S.