This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 17:13:47 (UTC).

JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD'S SERVICE COMPANY AKA JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD SERVICE COMPANY VS OWENS

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C KEPHART DBA LANDLORD'S SERVICE COMPANY AKA JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C KEPHART DBA LANDLORD SERVICE COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OWENS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1728

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD'S SERVICE COMPANY AKA JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD SERVICE COMPANY

Defendants

OWENS, RON

TURNER, CRYSTAL

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: VIA E-FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD'S SERVICE COMPANY AKA JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD SERVICE COMPANY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 204 EAST MCCORD AVENUE BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: OWENS, RON; TURNER, CRYSTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO RON OWENS AND CRYSTAL TURNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO CRYSTAL TURNER BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO RON OWENS BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD'S SERVICE COMPANY AKA JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD SERVICE COMPANY; Served: 03/10/2018; Served: 03/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 204 EAST MCCORD AVE. BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. is a litigant