This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 09:54:27 (UTC).

JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD SERVICE COMPANY AKA LANDLORD'S SERVICE COMPANY VS ROMERO

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C KEPHART DBA LANDLORD SERVICE COMPANY AKA LANDLORD'S SERVICE COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROMERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4207

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD SERVICE COMPANY AKA LANDLORD'S SERVICE COMPANY

Defendants

DIAZ, ANGELA

ROMERO, OSCAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD SERVICE COMPANY AKA LANDLORD'S SERVICE COMPANY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 8206 BLACKBURN ST. BAKERSFIELD, CA 93307 KERN COUNTY; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: ROMERO, OSCAR; DIAZ, ANGELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SUPERIOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO OSCAR ROMERO AND ANGELA DIAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO OSCAR ROMERO BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO ANGELA DIAZ BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS, JAMES KEPHART AND ERMA C. KEPHART DBA LANDLORD SERVICE COMPANY AKA LANDLORD'S SERVICE COMPANY; Served: 07/25/20178:00 PM; Served: 07/25/20178:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 8206 BLACKBURN ST, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS