Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 17:11:18 (UTC).

JAMES JOSEPH HAGOORT DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/08/2015 JAMES JOSEPH HAGOORT DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph Wm., Loo, Cynthia L., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4572

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph Wm.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAGOORT, JANICE

Decedent

HAGOORT, JAMES JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Original Type: Ruling; Ruling 03/27/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 11/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTES - 1. Accounting period is missing on Amended First and Final Account. 2. Need Disbursement schedule, bill statement insufficient. 3. Need loss schedule re sale. 4. Character of property stated as community property, with petitioner requesting $10,832.06 to be repaid to her. Is nature/character of the property decedent's separate property? 5. Proposed distribution is inconsistent to intestate succession in paragraph 17. Need new proposed distribution schedule consistent with Probate Code section 6401.

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 07/24/2019: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- AMENDED PETITION NOTES - 1. Accounting period is missing on Amended First and Final Account. 2. Need Disbursement schedule, bill statement insufficient. 3. Need loss schedule re sale. 4. Character of property stated as community property, with petitioner requesting $10,832.06 to be repaid to her. Is nature/character of the property decedent's separate property? 5. Proposed distribution is inconsistent to intestate succession in paragraph 17. Need new proposed distribution schedule consistent with Probate Code section 6401.; Parties Present Petitioner: HAGOORT, JANICE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NEW NOTE - 1. Summary of Account filed 11/19/18 indicates losses on sales of $36,837.03 inconsistent with Closing Disclosure. See Probate Code 1060, 1061, et. seq. as to schedules and itemization (e.g. losses/gains v. disbursements).; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Amended First and final account...returned via attorney out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Amended petition...returned via attorney out basket

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 11/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE- 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having previously been confined. NEW NOTES - 2. Supplement filed 09/18/18 reviewed and the following notes remain: a. Is the estate account in an interest bearing account per Probate Code? Need ALLEGATION that cash on hand was in an interest bearing account. b. Paragraph 14 makes reference to Waiver of Accounting. Are heirs waiving an account? Petitioner states a copy of DE-157 is attached. No copy of DE-157 attached as stated in the supplement. 3. Amended Summary of Account filed 09/21/18 does not comply with Prob. Code 1061. Need to itemized with charges and credits.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 08/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having previously been confined. 2. Need allegation that cash on hand was in an interest bearing account. 3. Account does not balance. Summary account filed 04/09/18 does not balance. 4. Paragraph 14 makes reference to Waiver of Accounting which is inconsistent with petition filed re First and Final Account. Need clarification by way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner: HAGOORT, JANICE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust... atty bin

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 02/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

7/27/17 MO: REPORT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: HAGOORT, JANICE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Compliance Hearing

MO Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 3/17/16, the Letters & $150,000 bond have not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Compliance Hearing

COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 11/17/15, the Order, Letters, $150,000 bond & color copy of petitioner's Driver's License have not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Petition for Letters

PETITION FOR LETTERS: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: HAGOORT, JANICE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 3/24/2020, HEARING CONTINUED FROM 4/15/2020*** final distribution/waiver of accounting re: amended first and final account, report of administrator and petition for allowance of statutory fees to personal representative and the attorney and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Original Type: Ruling; Ruling 03/27/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of F. Lutie Thompson regarding Final Distribution/waiver of Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Account - Comment: Waiver of Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 11/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTES - 1. Accounting period is missing on Amended First and Final Account. 2. Need Disbursement schedule, bill statement insufficient. 3. Need loss schedule re sale. 4. Character of property stated as community property, with petitioner requesting $10,832.06 to be repaid to her. Is nature/character of the property decedent's separate property? 5. Proposed distribution is inconsistent to intestate succession in paragraph 17. Need new proposed distribution schedule consistent with Probate Code section 6401.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: RE F|RST AND FINAL ACCOUNT; REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES TO PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND THE ATTORNEY AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND SUPPLEMENTS THERETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 07/24/2019: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- AMENDED PETITION NOTES - 1. Accounting period is missing on Amended First and Final Account. 2. Need Disbursement schedule, bill statement insufficient. 3. Need loss schedule re sale. 4. Character of property stated as community property, with petitioner requesting $10,832.06 to be repaid to her. Is nature/character of the property decedent's separate property? 5. Proposed distribution is inconsistent to intestate succession in paragraph 17. Need new proposed distribution schedule consistent with Probate Code section 6401.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 7/24/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketFinal Account and Report and Petition for Distribution - Comment: Amended First and Final Account, Report, Petition for allowance and final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NEW NOTE - 1. Summary of Account filed 11/19/18 indicates losses on sales of $36,837.03 inconsistent with Closing Disclosure. See Probate Code 1060, 1061, et. seq. as to schedules and itemization (e.g. losses/gains v. disbursements).

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2015
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Original Type: Petition for Letters; Judicial Officer: Wyatt, Ralph Wm.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Tentative Ruling: READY FOR HEARING READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketVerification - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: TO PETITION FOR PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT WITH FULL AUTHORITY 3/12/15 9:00AM P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PETITION FOR LETTERS...RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY OUT BASKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Docket874W PMT: Probate New Suit - 1st Petition <$250,000 GC - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for HAGOORT, JANICE (PE-1). Received from THOMPSON LAW, check no(s) 2403. Receipt #817501 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE