This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 00:18:12 (UTC).

JAMES-GUREVICH VS GUREVICH

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 JAMES-GUREVICH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GUREVICH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Webster, Jason W. and Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0110

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAMES-GUREVICH, SHAWNA K

Respondent

GUREVICH, DMITRY

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 06/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: JAMES-GUREVICH, SHAWNA K

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: JAMES-GUREVICH, SHAWNA K; GUREVICH, DMITRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: STATUS DATE 9/3/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: Arrangement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees - Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 06/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketNotice To Appear For Reconsideration Of Fee Waiver (FW-011)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CNL LEGAL DOC PREP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service - Comment: of Summons Service Date: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketAmended Petition - Comment: for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less