This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/29/2020 at 07:29:20 (UTC).

JAMES ALLEN NORRIS DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 JAMES ALLEN NORRIS DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kendall, Andrew and Myers, Brett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2002

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kendall, Andrew

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

NORRIS, OLENA

NORRIS, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

STOKER, IRA L

ROSS, MARK A.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/26/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letters of administration returned to attorney Ira Stoker via South Valley outbasket

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 02/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMotion - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 3/24/2020, HEARING CONTINUED FROM 04/09/2020*** Notice of motion and motion to change venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: petition for letters of administration authorization to administer under the independent administration of estates act with full authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/26/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketObjection/Opposition (Probate) - Comment: Objection to Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Notice of motion and motion to change venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letters of administration returned to attorney Ira Stoker via South Valley outbasket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 02/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 2/13/20 @8:30 am in Div P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.