This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:34:29 (UTC).

JAGER VS JAGER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 JAGER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JAGER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0351

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAGER, RACHEL N.

Respondent

JAGER, MARK D.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketProperty Declaration - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less