This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 01:00:36 (UTC).

JACOBS VS WILLIAMS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/17/2017 JACOBS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0025

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACOBS, TIMOTHY

Defendants

DOUGLAS, RANDY

WILLIAMS, TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 05/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: JACOBS, TIMOTHY; Defendant: WILLIAMS, TAYLOR; Defendant: DOUGLAS, RANDY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Small Claims Appeal; Type: Action; Filed By: 1166311663; Filed Against: 11663

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Small Claims Appeal; File Date: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: JACOBS, TIMOTHY; Awarded Against: WILLIAMS, TAYLOR; DOUGLAS, RANDY; Amount; Damages: $800.00; Costs: $90.00; Total: $890.00; Party: Name: JACOBS, TIMOTHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketExhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 05/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Defendant's Claim; Type: Action; Filed By: 1161211612; Filed Against: 11612

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Defendant's Claim; File Date: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WILLIAMS, TAYLOR, DOUGLAS, RANDY; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketClaim of Defendant - Comment: Hearing Date: 5/19/17 Hearing Time: 10:00 AM Department/Division:BR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: TAYLOR WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: RANDY DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: JACOBS, TIMOTHY; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less