This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 02:24:33 (UTC).

JACO VS COTO

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 JACO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COTO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S., McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0096

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JACO, MARY ANN

Respondent

COTO, CHRISTIAN OMAR JACO

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 12/22/2017: Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 12/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: JACO, MARY ANN; Respondent: COTO, CHRISTIAN OMAR JACO

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: JACO, MARY ANN; Respondent: COTO, CHRISTIAN OMAR JACO

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS ON: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: JACO, MARY ANN; COTO, CHRISTIAN OMAR JACO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Further - Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 12/22/2017: Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 12/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:45 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketStipulation For Supplemental Judgment - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Mediation Date: 12/19/2017 Hearing Date: 12/22/2017 Hearing Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: A

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketAmended Petition - Comment: For Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: JACO, MARY ANN; Served: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less