This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:59 (UTC).

JACKSON VS JACKSON

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 JACKSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JACKSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0358

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JACKSON, LACIE R.

Respondent

JACKSON, MATHEW D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Declaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less