This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 10:16:11 (UTC).

CORONA VS HOULE

Case Summary

On 09/29/2015 CORONA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOULE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0093

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORONA, FRANCIS

Defendants

JACKSON, JACQULINE

HOULE, JULIE

ROBINSON, DESTINY

ROBINSON, MADISON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE:Failure to Proceed to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: CORONA, FRANCIS; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 121 Shattuck Ave Taft, CA 93268 Kern; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: HOULE, JULIE; ROBINSON, DESTINY; ROBINSON, MADISON; JACKSON, JACQULINE; Party: Names: CORONA, FRANCIS; HOULE, JULIE; ROBINSON, DESTINY; ROBINSON, MADISON; JACKSON, JACQULINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: 121 Shattuck Ave Taft, CA 93268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Julie Houle/Destiny Robinson/Madison Robinson/Jacquline Jackson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by personal service as to Jacqline Jackson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by substituted service as to Madison Robinson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Substituted Service as to Destiny Robinson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Substituted Service as to Julie Houle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CORONA, FRANCIS; Served: 09/30/20158:00 PM; Served: 09/30/20158:00 PM; Served: 09/30/20158:00 PM; Served: 09/30/20158:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 121 SHATTUCK AVE TAFT, CA 93268 KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less