This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 07:51:01 (UTC).

JACKSON VS HOWARD

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 JACKSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOWARD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0017

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON, HAZELINE

Defendant

HOWARD, AARON WAYMAN

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Discharge of Bankruptcy - Comment: As to Aaron Wayman Howard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: JACKSON, HAZELINE; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Returned via pick up.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.