Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/22/2021 at 20:57:09 (UTC).

IRVING VS IRVING (B)

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 IRVING filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against IRVING B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cannon, Gloria and Marquez, Raymonda B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3356

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cannon, Gloria

Marquez, Raymonda B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IRVING, CAMERON D

Respondent

IRVING, KELSEY R

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RET'D VIA US MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Comment: HRG 01/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/14/20 PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS CONT FROM 11/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Comment: HRG 11/25/20 SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/14/20 PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RET'D VIA US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 10/15/20 Hearing Time: 11:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less