This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/29/2022 at 16:09:29 (UTC).

ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT AND IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT VS THE DOW COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT AND IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against THE DOW COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0041

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT

ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

Defendants

J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY

NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS, INC.

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

PUREGRO COMPANY

SHELL OIL COMPANY

SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY

THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBINS, TODD E

ROBINS TODD E

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/21/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: H

Proof of Service

06/06/2022: Proof of Service

Notice

06/03/2022: Notice

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

02/17/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Notice

02/17/2022: Notice

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/31/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/31/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/31/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/31/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/31/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/31/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/31/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/31/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

01/13/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case(s)

01/13/2022: Notice of Related Case(s)

Order to Show Cause

01/06/2022: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

01/06/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/06/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Comment: Amended Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order Granting Petition to Add Rosedale-Rio Bravo Water Storage District on to Coordination Proceeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit; Filed By: DEFENDANT - THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Notice of Stipulation to Coordinate Action; Filed By: DEFENDANT - THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Southern Valley Chemical Company; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to PureGro Company, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to J.R. Simplot Company, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Shell Oil Company individually and dba as Shell Chemical Company via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to The Dow Chemical Company; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Related Case(s); Comment: Notice of Related Cases; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 04/21/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - ROSEDALE-RIO BRAVO WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Puregro Company is a litigant

Latest cases where IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA WATER DISTRICT is a litigant