Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:25:31 (UTC).

IRENE THOMSON FLORES DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/27/2017 IRENE THOMSON FLORES DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2277

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JUAREZ, CHRISTINA Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MORAVEC, HENRY JOHN, III

VARGA, LINDA MORAVEC

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Inventory & Appraisal X2

Petition for Sale

Petition for Sale 07/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - 1304 Reese Avenue, Bakersfield, California 93307

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice to creditors.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER E-FILED

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER E-FILED

Court Trial

09/06/2017 MO: Court Trial: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE PERTAINS TO OBJECTION FILED 06/20/17. 1. Page 1 of objection appears to have others objecting; however, they did not sign. Need signature from each person objecting to petition.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MORAVEC, HENRY JOHN, III

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 07/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - ***MATTER SUBMITTED AS "PSP" - HOWEVER, OBJECTIONS WERE FILED ON 06/20/17*** NOTE PERTAINS TO OBJECTION FILED 06/20/17. 1. Page 1 of objection appears to have others objecting; however, they did not sign. Need signature from each person objecting to petition.; Parties Present Petitioner: JUAREZ, CHRISTINA Y; Attorney: MORAVEC, HENRY JOHN, III

Petition for Letters

05/26/17 MO: PETITION FOR LETTERS: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADING (PSP) ****TO BE HEARD BY COMMISSIONER KNIGHT***; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MORAVEC, HENRY JOHN, III

Petition for Letters

05/12/17 MO: PETITION FOR LETTER: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADING (PSP); Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MORAVEC, HENRY JOHN, III

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing to attorney's Henry J. Moravec & Linda M. Varga

Petition for Sale

Petition for Sale 01/09/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - (412 MT. VERNON AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD CA 93307)

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing (2) to attorney's Henry J. Moravec & Linda Moravec Varga for Christina Y. Juarez

Petition for Sale

Petition for Sale 11/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - 412 Mt Vernon Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93307 NOTES - 1. Vesting information is missing in #4. 2. Need Clerk's Certificate of Posting to be filed. No Notice of Hearing provided for clerk's posting.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: INVENTORY & APPRAISAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: INVENTORY & APPRAISAL X2

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: First supplement

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Report of Sale...returned via file & serve

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Account and report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: RE: FILING OF A PETITION TO CLOSE THE ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: RE: FILING OF PROOF OF DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketHearing on Status Report PC 12200 - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: Report of Status of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 08/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing to attorney's Henry J. Moravec & Linda M. Varga

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketAccount and Report - Comment: Account and Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Christina Y. Juarez regarding grant deed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Confirming Sale of Real Property - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Sale - Petition for Sale 01/09/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - (412 MT. VERNON AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD CA 93307)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - 05/12/17 MO: PETITION FOR LETTER: Judicial Officer(s): Myers, Brett, Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADING (PSP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 05/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARGA LINDA MORAVEC

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORAVEC, HENRY JOHN, III