Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:00:36 (UTC).

IRENE MARGARET SMITH-QUICK DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 IRENE MARGARET SMITH-QUICK DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2205

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUICK, DONALD E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REED, ROSETTA N

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 082715: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Need to state if decedents address is in the unincorporated area of Frazier Park in order to publish in the Daily Report. 2. Hearing date on proof of publication indicates hearing is on 10/01/15 & not 08/27/15. Need new proof of publication.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: REED, ROSETTA N

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

10/04/2017 MO: Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Need receipt from daughter/Christina Howell re preliminary distribution of 2006 Chevrolet. 2. Page #2 I&A filed 09/29/17 is not dated by referee. SUPPLEMENT FILED ON 09/21/17 AND REVIEWED, HOWEVER, THE FOLLOWING NOTE STILL REMAINS - 3. Receipt in Schedule A in the amount of $1,640 is dated 06/16/18, which is incorrect.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: REED, ROSETTA N

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 02/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE - 1. As of 1/20/17, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

Petition for Probate of Will

**MO - Probate Public: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: REED, ROSETTA N

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: on First and Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - 10/04/2017 MO: Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Need receipt from daughter/Christina Howell re preliminary distribution of 2006 Chevrolet. 2. Page #2 I&A filed 09/29/17 is not dated by referee. SUPPLEMENT FILED ON 09/21/17 AND REVIEWED, HOWEVER, THE FOLLOWING NOTE STILL REMAINS - 3. Receipt in Schedule A in the amount of $1,640 is dated 06/16/18, which is incorrect.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: REED, ROSETTA N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Michael Burger, Probate Referee, concerning lack of dating of referees signature on page 2 of Inventory and Appraisal prepared by his office for this matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Miscellaneous Filing - Comment: Amended schedule "A" (two) to probate accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Receipt - Comment: Receipt on preliminary distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Miscellaneous Filing - Comment: Amended Schedule "C" to probate accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Inventory with Property Tax Certificate - Comment: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Supplement - Comment: Second Supplement to First and final account and report of executor and petition for its settlement, and petition for final distribution, for allowance of compensation to executor and attorney for ordinary services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Miscellaneous Filing - Comment: Final seller's statement from Mid Valley Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Miscellaneous Filing - Comment: Amended Schedule "A" to probate accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2016
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 2/11/2016 @ 9:00 a.m. in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 082715: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Need to state if decedents address is in the unincorporated area of Frazier Park in order to publish in the Daily Report. 2. Hearing date on proof of publication indicates hearing is on 10/01/15 & not 08/27/15. Need new proof of publication.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: REED, ROSETTA N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Supplement - Comment: to Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Proof of Publication - Comment: in the Bakersfield News Observer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 8/27/15 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Last Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-15-001056 9/7/01 Five (5) pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Petition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via Attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less