Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 07:13:46 (UTC).

INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY VS CARMONA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2013 INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARMONA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7217

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Defendant

CARMONA, ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: TOTAL: $412.22 SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R WITT DATE: 02/25/14 AS TO ROBERTO CARMONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered - Comment: MONETARY DAMAGES AS TO ROBERTO CARMONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ISSUED ~ calid=2398554 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:01/23/2014, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, SystemDate:11/5/2013 10:25:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY (PL-1). Received from KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN, LLC, check no(s) 161310. Receipt #755083 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: ISSUED 12/23/13 PROPERTY: 295 WALNUT DRIVE #H ARVIN, CA 93203 / RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2013
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: ATTEMPTED TO SERVE ROBERTO CARMONA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jan 23, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jan 23, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEY'S CERTIFIED SERVICES, check no(s) 25954. Receipt #747019 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 295 WALNUT DRIVE #H ARVIN, CA 93203 COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Interstate Realty Management is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS