This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:28:30 (UTC).

INTERSTATE 2014 , LLC VS FLYNN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 INTERSTATE 2014 , LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLYNN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5898

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERSTATE 2014 , LLC

Defendant

FLYNN, NATASHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: INTERSTATE 2014 , LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 4801 Belle Terrace, Unit N, Bakersfield, California 93309; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: FLYNN, NATASHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: return via ams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: NATASHA FLYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: ANY PERSON CLAIMING POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: NATASHA FLYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN, INTERSTATE 2014 , LLC; Served: 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 4801 BELLE TERRACE, UNIT N, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less