This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:11:56 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB VS MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MUNOZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5761

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendants

MUNOZ, PETRA GABRIELA

VILLALOBOS, ALFREDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES, TODD F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Facts Re: Unsatisfied Judgment (DL30) - Comment: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Awarded Against: VILLALOBOS, ALFREDO; Amount; Damages: $9,354.53; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 7.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $931.10; Costs: $299.00; Total: $10584.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Against Alfredo Villalobos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Insured Declaration CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Todd F. Haines

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to defendant Petra Gabriela Munoz only; without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration Re OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only as to ALFREDO VILLALOBOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO ALFREDO VILLALOBOS, SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.