Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:00:58 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS PASILLAS

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PASILLAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1014

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

PASILLAS, JESS PAUL WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORONA, SALVADOR

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Minute Order- Case Management Conference 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

4/4/16 MO: OSC RE: CRC Rule 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Minute Order-Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: cont'd from 4/4/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - 4/4/16 MO: OSC RE: CRC Rule 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: as to JESS PAUL WAYNE PASILLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Statement of Damages - Comment: as to JESS PAUL WAYNE PASILLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): STATEMENT OF DAMAGES NEEDS TO BE FILED WITH YOUR DEFAULT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.110 SCHEDULED FOR 4/4/16, 830AM, DEPT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Cont'd from 10/26/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Minute Order- Case Management Conference 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: plaintiff's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: SUBSTITUTED, AS TO, JESS PAUL WAYNE PASILLAS. 12/05/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Minute Order-Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-26-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SALVADOR CORONA CMC 1-11-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less