This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 00:34:43 (UTC).

INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF HTE AUTOMOBILE CLUB VS BASHAM

Case Summary

On 09/01/2010 INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF HTE AUTOMOBILE CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BASHAM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodward, Cory J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1355

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Woodward, Cory J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF HTE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Defendants

BASHAM AUTOMOTIVE

BASHAM, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE LA FLOR, ANDREW R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF HTE AUTOMOBILE CLUB (PL-1). Received from INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF HT, check no(s) 11667. Receipt #711183 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs and Credits - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: NAME CHANGE & ADDRESS FOR THE PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEYS OFFICE NEW NAME IS DE LA FLOR & ASSOCIATES NEW ADDRESS IS 31111 N. TUSTIN AVENUE, SUITE 140 ORANGE, CA 92865

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF HTE AUTOMOBILE CLUB (PL-1). Received from DE LA FLOR, check no(s) 3195. Receipt #596827 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF OSC WHO SERVED:DAVID BASHAM, DBA BASHAM AUTOMOTIVE HOW SERVED:PERSONAL SERVICE BY SUB-SERVICE UPON JESSICA BASHAM DATE SERVED:9/21/10 SERVICE FEES: $83.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF OSC WHO SERVED:DAVID BASHAM HOW SERVED:PERSONAL SERVICE BY SUB-SERVICE UPON MS. BASHAM DATE SERVED:9/28/10 SERVICE FEES: $83.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 09, 2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 09, 2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • Docket844J Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) (7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $330.00 for INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF HTE AUTOMOBILE CLUB (PL-1). Received from ANDREW R. DE LA FLOR, check no(s) 2355. Receipt #545751 for amount of $330.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE LA FLOR ANDREW R.