This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 16:03:22 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST VS TALBOT

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TALBOT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1637

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Defendant

TALBOT, MICHAEL THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LINSAO, MILJOY B

LOWE, JEFFREY E

JAVAN, ROBERT B.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 01/26/2021: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice as to Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 01/26/2021: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Order to Appear - Comment: and Show Cause Why This Matter Should Not be Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 01/12/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Change Of Assigned Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Miljoy B. Linsao New Attorney: Jeffrey E. Lowe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Michael Thomas Talbot via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Pending Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/11/202011:25 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINSAO, MILJOY B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAVAN, ROBERT B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOWE, JEFFREY E