This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 21:09:05 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST ET AL VS HAZEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/30/2015 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAZEL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4717

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

McTaggart, Matthew

RITCHIE, LOGAN

Defendants

HAZEL, BECKY

FLETCHER, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUGLASS JONATHAN W

SCHECHTER BRUCE L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CRC 3.1385 cont 09/05/18 As to Complaint in Child Case S-1500-CV-284752

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 09/05/18 As to Complaint in Child Case S-1500-CV-284752

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: As to Complaint in Child Case S-1500-CV-284752.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Notice of Settlement - Lead Case number must listed first - 3.350(d)

Ruling

Minute Order 7/12/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 07/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: WHY COMPLAINT OF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal & CMC 03/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS BECKY HAZEL AND JOHN FLETCHER (IN CONSOLIDATED CASE CV-284752) FOR NON-COMPLIANCE WITH CRC RULE 3.110B RE: POS Cont'd from 06/06/16, 09/06/16, 12/05/16 **Specially set at 8:00 a.m. CMC also on cal**; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: LINSAO, MILJOY B

Further Case Management Conference

03/07/16 - MO - Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (cont'd from 01/21/16) ***Consolidated action: cv-284752***; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: LINSAO, MILJOY B

Further Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (CONT'D FROM 09/06/16)

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

01/03/2019: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

10/04/2018: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

09/05/2018: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Ruling

07/12/2018: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

07/02/2018: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Further Case Management Conference

06/05/2017: Further Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference

03/06/2017: Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference

12/05/2016: Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference

09/06/2016: Further Case Management Conference

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order Dismissing Action (Full); Comment: Without Prejudice Pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1385

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 10; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 10; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Notice of Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 10; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: As to the Complaint in S-1500-CV-284717 (LEAD CASE) ONLY - With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Settlement Unconditional; Comment: As to S-1500-CV-284752

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: RE: Notice of Settlement - Lead Case number must listed first - 3.350(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 10; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Rebeccah Lee Hazel by personal service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Pending Action; Comment: Pursuant to labor code section 3853.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: ON COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Damages; Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint - Fast Track; Comment: FILED BY MILJOY B. LINSAO, ESQ; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 1/21/2016 8:00 DEPARTMENT 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 29, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 29, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketFile Type: CONV; Comment: New case created.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less