This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 20:39:09 (UTC).

INSTALLED BUILDING PRODUCTS, LLC. ET AL VS CHAPMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 INSTALLED BUILDING PRODUCTS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHAPMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Chapin, Sidney P. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2264

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INSTALLED BUILDING PRODUCTS, LLC.

BROKEN DRUM OF BAKERSFIELD, INC.

Defendants

CHAPMAN, STEVEN

VARSITY DOORS, INC.

VARSITY DOORS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHAPMAN, DANIEL

CHAPMAN, ERIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARCIA, DAVID AUGUSTUS

JOYCE, BOB H

Defendant Attorneys

DODGIN, DUSTIN S

BRAUN, CRAIG D

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons must specify "First Amended." Please correct and resubmit.

Ruling

Ruling 11/30/2017: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration of Chris Cooper rejected in File and Serve

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Ruling

Ruling 10/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/28/17 Plaintiffs FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT ISSUE A PRELIMINARY OR PERMANENT INJUNCTION (Cont'd from 09/29/17); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GARCIA, DAVID AUGUSTUS; Plaintiff; Attorney: GARCIA, DAVID AUGUSTUS; Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 09/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 9/27/2017 Filed by Carolyn E. Sieve on behalf of Installed Building Products, LLC and Broken Drum of Bakersfield, Inc. PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR AN EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT ISSUE A PRELIMINARY OR PERMANENT INJUNCTION; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GARCIA, DAVID AUGUSTUS; Plaintiff; Attorney: GARCIA, DAVID AUGUSTUS

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT ENVELOPE #876727

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/10/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 07/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/19/18 Plaintiff, BROKEN DRUM OF BAKERSFIELD, INC. Motion for Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction Judgment, and Order ResID: 31237; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GARCIA, DAVID AUGUSTUS; Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Plaintiff; Attorney: GARCIA, DAVID AUGUSTUS

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 06/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/16/2018 PLAINTIFF BROKEN DRUM OF BAKERSFIELD, INC. MOTION SEEKING ENTRY OF PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF TRADE SECRETS ResID: 30934; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: JOYCE, BOB H; Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: David Garcia Document: Summons as to the Third Amended Complaint Summons does not conform to the Third Amended Complaint. Must identify summons being related to the Third Amended Complaint.

Demurrer

Demurrer 04/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DEFENDANTS STEVEN CHAPMAN, DANIEL CHAPMAN AND VARSITY DOORS, INC. DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: JOYCE, BOB H; Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: JOYCE, BOB H; Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

Ruling

Ruling 04/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order 3/28/18: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: MISSING RE-NOTICE FEE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Association rejected: Both the attorney of record and the newly added attorney's signature are required. Returned via Lebeau and Thelen bin

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refund for $435 to Dustin S Dodgin (Klein Denatale ET AL LLP). Completed on 08/08/18. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: PERMANENT INJUNCTION, JUDGMENT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Motion (Pre-Disposition) 07/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/19/18 Plaintiff, BROKEN DRUM OF BAKERSFIELD, INC. Motion for Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction Judgment, and Order ResID: 31237

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Plaintiff Broken Drum of Bakersfield, Inc.'s Motion Seeking Entry of Plaintiff's Designation of Trade Secrets cont'd from 6/13/18 (Parties working out a settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: LEBEAU THELEN Date of Letter: 6/22/18 Re: Motion off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Motion for Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction Judgment, and Order Hearing Date: 7/12/18 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Motion (Pre-Disposition) 06/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/16/2018 PLAINTIFF BROKEN DRUM OF BAKERSFIELD, INC. MOTION SEEKING ENTRY OF PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF TRADE SECRETS ResID: 30934

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (Meet and Confer) - Comment: UNABLE TO MEET AND CONFER * 30 DAY EXTENSION PURSUANT TO CCP 435.5(a)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Brian Casper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Evan Eggenburg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Johny Ybarra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of David A. Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: Ex Parte Application??/Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT ENVELOPE #876727

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/10/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/11/2017; Served: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Envelope Details Page 2 of 3

Status Rejected

M* AL A

Court Fee Service Fee

y. '. "?”*”"“ Y

PM COMPLAINT

Ledd‘Documem‘ | Sfimmons;pdf | [Original] )

‘Associatec Party/Busmess Name INSTALLED BUILDING PRODUCTS, LLC. BROKEN DRUM OF BAKERSFIELD, INC.

Flllng Type EFile

Filing Code | Complaint

Filing Description Complaint

Reference Number 2

Comments

Status Accepted

Accepted Date 09/27/2017 04:28:04 PM

Effective August 15, 2016, Notices for 3.740 hearings, 3.110 hearings, CMCs, and Notice of

Accept Comments Assignment are available online. See Court’s website. Use your assigned case number to retrieve notices.

Court Fee Service Fee

Lead Document " Final Complaint IBP.pdf [Original] [Transmitted]

https://california.tylerhost.net/EnvelopeDetails.aspx?envelopeguid=39dd5287-efd4-43e2-9... 9/27/2017