This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 15:56:53 (UTC).

INDIAN CREEK VILLAS APTS., INC. VS PALPA

Case Summary

On 02/27/2014 INDIAN CREEK VILLAS APTS , INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PALPA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Zulfa, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2233

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Zulfa, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INDIAN CREEK VILLAS APTS., INC.

Defendants

PALPA, MISTY D

MANZO, YESSICA V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISMAN, JESSICA S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: DESTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketCase Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section - Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Comment: 68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketNP4170 - Comment: Department: BM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY. CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • Docket4003 Order to Show Cause - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for INDIAN CREEK VILLAS APTS., INC. (PL-1). Received from KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, check no(s) 167737. Receipt #773586 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • DocketDeclaration and Order to Post Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Docket185D Pmt: Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons - Comment: Amount of $20.00 for INDIAN CREEK VILLAS APTS., INC. (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEY'S CERTIFIED SERVICES, check no(s) 18677. Receipt #768664 for amount of $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 5/29/2014 at 1:30PM in Department BM, 1773 HIGHWAY 58, MOJAVE, CA 93501, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES OF COURT 3.17.1(C) WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 5/29/2014 at 1:30PM in Department BM, 1773 HIGHWAY 58, MOJAVE, CA 93501, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES OF COURT 3.17.1(C) WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ BRYAN K STAINFIELD Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for INDIAN CREEK VILLAS APTS., INC. (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEY'S CERTIFIED SERVICES, check no(s) 8594. Receipt #765403 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISMAN, JESSICA S