This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/21/2018 at 04:02:28 (UTC).

INDERJIT DHILLON VS GREWAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 INDERJIT DHILLON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GREWAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1506

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

DHILLON, INDERJIT

Defendants

GREWAL, NAVDEEP

U.S. CITY LINK CORPORATION

NAVDEEP GREWAL, D.B.A., CITY REGISTRATION SERVICE

NAVDEEP GREWAL, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA CITY REGISTRATION SERVICE

US CITYLINK CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff

NAVDEEP GREWAL, INDIVIDUAL AND DBA CITY REGISTRATION SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

KUMMER, DIXON G

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAUN, CRAIG D

WELLS, DAVID J

 

Court Documents

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Motion for Judgment & CMC 05/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CMC

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 04/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMMER, DIXON G; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Cross Defendant; Attorney: KUMMER, DIXON G; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMMER, DIXON G; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Cross Defendant; Attorney: KUMMER, DIXON G; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

Case Management Conference

**MO - demurrer and cmc Public: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: estimate 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: estimate 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; ENTIRE ACTION COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Answer - Comment: TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO NAVDEEP GREWAL, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA CITY REGISTRATION SERVICE, AND US CITYLINK CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Declaration (Meet and Confer) - Comment: Declaration in Support of Automatic Extension

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Third Amended Complaint - Comment: RETURNED VIA SOUTH VALLEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IS GRANTED; THE MOTION IS GRANTED WITH 30 DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND. ANY AMENDED PLEADING MUST BE FILED NO LATER THAN 6/1/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Letter Received - Comment: Letter From: CRAIG D. BRAUN Date of Letter: 5/10/17 Re: PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Judgment - Motion for Judgment & CMC 05/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/5/17 Defendant, NAVDEEP GREWAL, ind & dba City Registration Service, & US CITYLINK CORPORATION Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint] ResID: 24444; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMMER, DIXON G; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Cross Defendant; Attorney: KUMMER, DIXON G; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D; Defendant; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG D

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2016
  • Notice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: Demurrer to Complaint of Plaintiff, Inderjit Dhillon Hearing Date: 10/13/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Declaration (Meet and Confer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO NAVDEEP GREWAL DBA CITY REGISTRSTION SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO US CITY BANK, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO NAVDEEP GREWAL, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SOUTH VALLEY ATTORNEY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/14/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less