This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:53:16 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF SALAZAR

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 IN THE MATTER OF SALAZAR was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R., Palmer, William D. and Shayer, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0032

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SALAZAR, AMANDA D

 

Court Documents

Petition for Change of Name

**MO - Public: **MO - Public: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: CHANGE NAME FROM: KHILY GARZA TO: KHILY SALAZAR; Parties Present Petitioner: SALAZAR, AMANDA D

Fee Waiver Review (Post-Disposition)

Fee Waiver Review (Post-Disposition) 11/04/2016: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: SALAZAR, AMANDA D

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Change of Name - **MO - Public: **MO - Public: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: CHANGE NAME FROM: KHILY GARZA TO: KHILY SALAZAR; Parties Present Petitioner: SALAZAR, AMANDA D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Fee Waiver Review (Post-Disposition) - Fee Waiver Review (Post-Disposition) 11/04/2016: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: SALAZAR, AMANDA D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice on Hearing About Court Fees - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Request For Hearing About Court Fees (FW-006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Order to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Incomplete - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less