Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:14:21 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF RENAU J. RUSH

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 IN THE MATTER OF RENAU J RUSH was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0549

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUSH, RENAU J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2015
  • Petition for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: ADULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Decree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Proof of Publication - Comment: Ran in El Popular Newspaper. August 21, 28. September 4, 11 all of 2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • CLETS Check Returned - Comment: KCSO CLEARED FOR HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Request for CLETS Report - Comment: TO KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: PUBLISH IN EL POPULAR Hearing Date: 10/15/15 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO RENAU J. RUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO RENAU J. RUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Petition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less