Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:14:19 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 IN THE MATTER OF RAMIREZ was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R. and Staley, H.A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0004

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RAMIREZ, FELIX

RAMIREZ, ELIDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Petition for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Minor Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • Decree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Comment: Without a Hearing Jared Julian Ramirez is changed to Julian Jared Ramirez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Proof of Publication - Comment: El Popular Published 7/17, 24, 31 and 8/7/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Order to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: Legal Document Assistant Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Petition for Change of Name - Comment: Minor

    Read MoreRead Less