This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:13:07 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF MIGUEL CRUZ QUINTANILLA

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 IN THE MATTER OF MIGUEL CRUZ QUINTANILLA was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2496

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUINTANILLA, MIGUEL CRUZ

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: - MISSING FORM: NC-110 ATTACHMENT TO PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

01/18/17 MO: Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: why the exparte letter purportedly from George Camacho, publisher of El Popular and accompaying affidavit of publisher should not be rejected.; Parties Present Petitioner: QUINTANILLA, MIGUEL CRUZ

Ruling

01/17/17 MO: RULING: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Petition for Change of Name

12/22/16 MO: Petition for Change of Name: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ADULT; Parties Present Petitioner: QUINTANILLA, MIGUEL CRUZ

Ruling

12/22/16 MO: Ruling on Petition for Change of Name: Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 1 ADULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketDecree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: SIGNED AND GRANTED WITHOUT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: PUBLISHED IN THE BAKERSFIELD NEWS OBSERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketCLETS Check Returned - Comment: KCSO CLEARED FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketRequest for CLETS Report - Comment: SENT TO KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketAmended Order to Show Cause - Comment: To: Publish in the Bakersfield News Observer Hearing Date: April 24, 2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketAmended Petition - Comment: for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: - MISSING FORM: NC-110 ATTACHMENT TO PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - 01/18/17 MO: Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: why the exparte letter purportedly from George Camacho, publisher of El Popular and accompaying affidavit of publisher should not be rejected.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - 01/17/17 MO: RULING: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: George Camacho - Publisher/General Manager of El Popular Date of Letter: January 6, 2017 Re: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: PUBLISHED IN EL POPULAR NOVEMBER 18, 25, 2016 & DECEMBER 2, 9, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - 12/22/16 MO: Petition for Change of Name: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ADULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - 12/22/16 MO: Ruling on Petition for Change of Name: Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketCLETS Check Returned - Comment: KCSO CLEARED FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketRequest for CLETS Report - Comment: TO KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: To Publish in El Popular Hearing Date: 12-22-16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less