This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2023 at 06:05:05 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF MARSELINO BARRAGAN

Case Summary

On 07/01/2011 IN THE MATTER OF MARSELINO BARRAGAN was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0191

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARRAGAN, MARSELINO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2011

DocketFile Type: 134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06; Comment: Amount of $0.50 for BARRAGAN, MARSELINO (PE-1). Received from MARSELINO BARRAGAN. Receipt #618322 for amount of $0.50.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2011

HearingHearing Type: Petition for Change of Name; Dept.: Lamont Division A; Result: CONV

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2011

DocketFile Type: Decree Changing Name; Comment: NEW NAME: MARSELINO BARRAGANSIGNED BY: JUDGE ALISA R. KNIGHTDATE: 10/06/11; Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRAGAN, MARSELINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2011

DocketFile Type: NP1610; Comment: Department: BLCalendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS:MARSELINO BARRAGAN (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA.ALICIA ORTEGA-WELCH PRESENT AND DULY SWORN AS SPANISH INTERPRETER FOR PETITIONER.STIPULATION RE: JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED AND INCORPORATED HEREIN BY REFERENCE.PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES.PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME GRANTED.NEW NAME SHALL BE: MARSELINO BARRAGAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2011

DocketFile Type: 4070 Petition for Change of Name; Comment: Hearing Entered.Calendar Notes: PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2011

DocketFile Type: Proof of Publication; Comment: WHAT PUBLISHED: NOTICE OF REQUEST OF NAME CHANGE PUBLICATION DATES: 08/11/11, 07/21/11, 07/28/11, 08/04/11; Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRAGAN, MARSELINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2011

DocketFile Type: CLETS Check Returned - KCSO; Comment: APPLICANT IS NOT CURRENTLY UNDER THE JURISDICTION OF THE DEPT OF CORRECTIONS NOR IS HE/SHE REQUIRED TO REGISTER AS A SEX OFFENDER (KERN COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT; Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRAGAN, MARSELINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2011

DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Comment: SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITTDATE: 07/05/11COPIES MAILED TO MARSELINO BARRAGAN 07/05/11; Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRAGAN, MARSELINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2011

DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: RE: MARSELINO BARRAGANHEARING DATE: 10/06/11SERVICE: BAKERSFIELD CALIFORNIAN TO PUBLISH NAME CHANGE NOTICES; Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRAGAN, MARSELINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2011

DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Comment: FILED BY: MARSELINO BARRAGANDATE: 07/01/11; Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRAGAN, MARSELINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2011

DocketFile Type: Petition for Change of Name; Comment: ADULT; Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRAGAN, MARSELINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2011

DocketFile Type: Request for CLETS Report; Comment: TO: Sheriff Civil, County of KernRE: Application for Change of Name CASE NO.: [~Master_File.cs_no_ct_typ]-[~Master_File.cs_no_loc]- [~Master_File.cs_no_cs_cat]-[~Master_File.cs_no_cs_no], [~Master_File.judge_code], [~cs_nm_title] PETITIONER: MARSELINO BARRAGAN HEARING DATE: 10/6/2011REQUEST FOR CLETS/CJIS REPORT________________________________________________________________________SECTION 1APPLICANT: MARSELINO BARRAGAN AKA MARSELINO DIAS DOB: 11/17/1981 SEX: MALEThe above-named applicant has filed with the Superior Court of California, County of Kern an application for change of name. Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 1279.5(e) this court is requesting you to use the California Law Enforcement Telecommunications System (CLETS) and Criminal Justice Information System (CJIS) to determine whether or not this person is under the jurisdiction of the Department of Corrections or is required to register as a sex offender pursuant to Penal Code 290. Please make the determination and report your findings to the court in Section 2 below:Calendar Notes: TO: Sheriff Civil, County of KernRE: Application for Change of Name CASE NO.: L-1504- CV-100191, GRW, IN THE MATTER OF MARSELINO BAR PETITIONER: MARSELINO BARRAGAN HEARING DATE: 10/6/2011REQUEST FOR CLETS/CJIS REPORT________________________________________________________________________SECTION 1APPLICANT: MARSELINO BARRAGAN AKA MARSELINO DIAS DOB: 11/17/1981 SEX: MALEThe above-named applicant has filed with the Superior Court of California, County of Kern an application for change of name. Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 1279.5(e) this court is requesting you to use the California Law Enforcement Telecommunications System (CLETS) and Criminal Justice Information System (CJIS) to determine whether or not this person is under the jurisdiction of the Department of Corrections or is required to register as a sex offender pursuant to Penal Code 290. Please make the determination and report your findings to the court in Section 2 below:; Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRAGAN, MARSELINO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2011

DocketFile Type: CONV; Comment: New case created by deputy: 687

[+] Read More [-] Read Less