This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:55:43 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF MARK THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 IN THE MATTER OF MARK THOMPSON was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0474

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Defendant

MARK THOMPSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Order Granting Petition for Application of Transfer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: of Structured Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Petition to Approve Transfer Structured Settlmnt Pymnt Rts - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Order Approving Compromise of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Notice - Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Notice of Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: First Amended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Petition for Approval for Transfer Structured Settlement - Comment: Payment Rights

    Read MoreRead Less