This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:35 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF LUIS ANGEL TRUJILLO

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 IN THE MATTER OF LUIS ANGEL TRUJILLO was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2280

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRUJILLO, LUIS ANGEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 1 ADULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketDecree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: GRANTED AND SIGNED WITHOUT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: PUBLISHED OCTOBER 14, 21, 28, NOVEMBER 4, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketCLETS Check Returned - Comment: KCSO CLEARED FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketRequest for CLETS Report - Comment: SENT TO KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: TO PUBLISH IN THE DAILY REPORT. HEARING DATE: 11/30/2017 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.