This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 07:21:24 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF JUAN MANUEL TARIN

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 IN THE MATTER OF JUAN MANUEL TARIN was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0827

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TARIN, JUAN MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Kevin K. Cholakian Re: Civil Case Cover Sheet Reason: Incorrect Case type, incorrect Courthouse address

Petition

Petition 06/14/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: In the matter of Juan Manuel Tarin Petition to perpetuate testimony and evidence before commencement of action.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Non, Fast Track; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketOrder After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 06/14/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: In the matter of Juan Manuel Tarin Petition to perpetuate testimony and evidence before commencement of action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TARIN, JUAN MANUEL; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Kevin K. Cholakian Re: Civil Case Cover Sheet Reason: Incorrect Case type, incorrect Courthouse address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Melvin F. Marcian in Support of Verified Petition for Order of Pre-Commencement Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition to Perpetuate Testimony and Evidence before Commencement of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K.