This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/01/2020 at 07:16:47 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF JENNY TORRES PEREZ

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 IN THE MATTER OF JENNY TORRES PEREZ was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEREZ, JENNY TORRES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: 1 adult CLETS Okay/ Publication Okay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDecree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Granted and signed without a hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: Published in the Daily Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCLETS Check Returned - Comment: KCSO cleared for hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for CLETS Report - Comment: sent to KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: to be published in the Daily Report hrg: 3/10/20 @830am dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.