This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:07 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF ISAMAR MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 IN THE MATTER OF ISAMAR MARTINEZ was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2364

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CORONA, MAIRANY ISAMAR ALDACO

Minor

MARTINEZ, ISAMAR

 

Court Documents

Petition for Change of Name

Petition for Change of Name 12/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: CORONA, MAIRANY ISAMAR ALDACO

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDecree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Comment: GRANTED AND SIGNED IN OPEN COURT 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - Petition for Change of Name 12/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: PUBLISHED OCTOBER 24, 31; NOVEMBER 7, 14, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketCLETS Check Returned - Comment: KCSO CLEARED FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: AS TO MANUEL MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketRequest for CLETS Report - Comment: SENT TO KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: TO PUBLISH IN THE DAILY REPORT. NON-PETITIONING PARENT TO BE SERVED AS REQUIRED BY CCP 1227 HERING DATE:12/11/2017 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO MAIRANY ISAMA ALDACO CORONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less