This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:47:29 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF ISABEL ORONA

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 IN THE MATTER OF ISABEL ORONA was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2491

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORONA, ISABEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Petition for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: ADULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Decree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: GRANTED WITHOUT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Proof of Publication - Comment: El Popular October 21, 28, 2016 and November 4, 11, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • CLETS Check Returned - Comment: KCSO CLEARED FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Request for CLETS Report - Comment: TO KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: To Publish in El Popular Hearing Date: 12-22-16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO ISABEL ORONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO ISABEL ORONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less