This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:34 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF HEIDY CATALON

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 IN THE MATTER OF HEIDY CATALON was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0686

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CATALAN, HEIDY

Minor

GOMEZ, ABIGAIL NAOMI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketDecree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: GRANTED & SIGNED WITHOUT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: PUBLISHED IN THE DAILY REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketCLETS Check Returned - Comment: KCSO CLEARED FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketRequest for CLETS Report - Comment: SENT TO KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: TO PUBLISH IN THE DAILY REPORT HEARING DATE: JUNE 5, 2017 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less