This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:19:45 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF HARJINDER SINGH

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 IN THE MATTER OF HARJINDER SINGH was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SINGH, HARJINDER

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 1 adult

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDecree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: granted and signed without hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: Published in the Daily Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCLETS Check Returned - Comment: KCSO cleared for hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for CLETS Report - Comment: sent to KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: To be published in the Daily Report hrg: 4/2/20 @830 am dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition - Comment: for Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.