This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/19/2020 at 13:31:55 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF CYNTHIA CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 IN THE MATTER OF CYNTHIA CHAVEZ was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2243

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHAVEZ, CYNTHIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 1 ADULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCLETS Check Returned - Comment: Cleared for hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for CLETS Report - Comment: SENT TO KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: TO BE PUBLISHED IN THE BAKERSFIELD NEWS OBSERVER HRG: 11/30/20 @830AM DEPT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less