This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 13:55:06 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF CRUZ HERNANDEZ & HILDA CARDENAS

Case Summary

On 06/18/2009 IN THE MATTER OF CRUZ HERNANDEZ HILDA CARDENAS was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0154

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ, CRUZ

CARDENAS, HILDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/30/2009

Docket180C Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for CARDENAS HILDA (PL-2). Received from HILDA CARDENAS. Receipt #488717 for amount of $25.00. Detail: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2009

DocketDecree Changing Name - Comment: SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITT DATE: 9/3/09 FORMER NAME: NANCY HERNANDEZ CARDENAS CHANGED TO: NANCY HERNANDEZ-CARDENAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2009

DocketNP1615 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (MINOR) ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):090309/1400. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CRUZ HERNANDEZ (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. HILDA CARDENAS (PL-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME GRANTED. SAID MINOR'S NEW NAME SHALL BE NANCY HERNANDEZ-CARDENAS THE DECREE CHANGING NAME IS SUBMITTED AND SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. THE PARTIES ARE TO FOLLOW UP WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR ENDORSED COPIES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2009

Docket4070 Petition for Change of Name - Comment: Hearing Entered.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2009

DocketPetition for Change of Name - Original Type: Petition for Change of Name; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2009

DocketProof of Publication - Comment: WHAT PUBLISHED: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME PUBLICATION DATES: JULY 22, 29, AUGUST 5,12 2009

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2009

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: RE: HEARING DATE: SERVICE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2009

DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Fees - Comment: GRANTED IN WHOLE GRANTED BY: JUDGE LOUIE VEGA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2009

DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Fees - Comment: GRANTED IN PART GRANTED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITT ALL FEES WAIVED: FILING PAPERS, CERTIFICATION AND COPYING, COURT-APPOINTED INTERPRETER & REPORTER'S FEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2009

DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: amandaa

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2009

DocketPetition for Change of Name - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2009

DocketApplication for Waiver of Fee - Comment: SUBMITTED BY: HILDA CARDENAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2009

DocketApplication for Waiver of Fee - Comment: SUBMITTED BY: CRUZ HERNANDEZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less