This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 07:31:42 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF CAMFFERMAN

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 IN THE MATTER OF CAMFFERMAN was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAMFFERMAN, JADON JAMES

 

Court Documents

Petition for Change of Name

Petition for Change of Name 03/09/2020: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Party: Name: CAMFFERMAN, JADON JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDecree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - Petition for Change of Name 03/09/2020: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.