This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/09/2020 at 06:14:58 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF GAYLE MARIE BECKER

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 IN THE MATTER OF GAYLE MARIE BECKER was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3405

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BECKER, GAYLE MARIE

Defendant

GAYLE MARIE BECKER

 

Court Documents

Petition for Change of Name

Petition for Change of Name 02/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1 adult CLETS OK / PUB OK

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDecree Changing Name - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - Petition for Change of Name 02/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1 adult CLETS OK / PUB OK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCLETS Check Returned - Comment: KCSO cleared for hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: published in the Daily Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for CLETS Report - Comment: sent KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: to be published in the Daily Report hrg 2/26/20 @830am dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less