This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:51:52 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF ASHLEY SMITH A/K/A ASHLEY BENNETT

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 IN THE MATTER OF ASHLEY SMITH A/K/A ASHLEY BENNETT was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Holladay, Brandon. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0596

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CATALINA STRUCTURED FUNDING, INC.

Respondent

ASHELY SMITH A/K/A BENNETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

CHAIT, EVAN S

MILTON, CHRISTOPHER R

 

Court Documents

Petition to Approve Transfer Structured Settlmnt Pymnt Rts

Petition to Approve Transfer Structured Settlmnt Pymnt Rts 04/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CHAIT, EVAN S; Respondent: ASHELY SMITH A/K/A BENNETT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketOrder Granting Petition for Application of Transfer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: of Structured Settlement Agreement **AMENDED**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Non, Fast Track; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketOrder Granting Petition for Application of Transfer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: of Structured Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Approve Transfer Structured Settlmnt Pymnt Rts - Petition to Approve Transfer Structured Settlmnt Pymnt Rts 04/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Statutorily Executed Transfer Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Jessica Arita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CATALINA STRUCTURED FUNDING, INC.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG: 4/17/17 @8:30AM DEPT:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPetition (Initiating)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.