This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/16/2020 at 09:58:39 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF ALEXANDRO ARTURO CONTRERAS

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 IN THE MATTER OF ALEXANDRO ARTURO CONTRERAS was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0398

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CONTRERAS, ALEXANDRO ARTURO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 1 Adult

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for CLETS Report - Comment: Sent to KCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: to be published in The Daily Report. Hearing Date 5/14/2020 Hearing Time; 8:30am. Department 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.